RI S2442 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Towns And Cities - Zoning Ordinances (would Make Plant Agriculture A Permitted Use Within All Lands Subject To The Jurisdiction Of The Ri Coastal Resources Management Council And Grants To The Dem Jurisdiction And Enforcement Of Such Use.)
Title
An Act Relating To Towns And Cities - Zoning Ordinances (would Make Plant Agriculture A Permitted Use Within All Lands Subject To The Jurisdiction Of The Ri Coastal Resources Management Council And Grants To The Dem Jurisdiction And Enforcement Of Such Use.)
Sponsors
Sen. David Bates [R] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
Sen. William Walaska [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-20 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-14 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-06-11 | House passed Sub A in concurrence | |
2012-06-08 | Placed on House Calendar (06/11/2012) | |
2012-06-06 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence | |
2012-06-01 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2012) | |
2012-05-17 | Referred to House Municipal Government | |
2012-05-16 | Senate passed Sub A | |
2012-05-10 | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/16/2012) | |
2012-05-09 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2012-05-04 | Scheduled for consideration (05/09/2012) | |
2012-02-29 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-02-27 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/29/2012) | |
2012-02-16 | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/SenateText12/S2442.pdf |