RI S2437 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allow the Rhode Island Resource Recovery Corporation to consider the option of waste to energy.
Title
Rhode Island Resource Recovery Corporation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2014) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/SenateText14/S2437.pdf |