RI S2413 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends "Former Spouse Divorced" to include married for ten or more years and required by court order to support post divorce.
Title
Teachers' Retirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/26/2022) |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/13/2022) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |