RI S2268 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Portsmouth to exempt or stabilize taxes on qualified property used for manufacturing or commercial purposes in the town of Portsmouth.
Title
Portsmouth Commercial Fines
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-01 - Senate - Portsmouth commercial fines approval of amendment lc 004351/2 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2016-06-17 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-15 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2016-06-12 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/15/2016) |
2016-06-02 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/01/2016) |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2016) |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2016) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |