RI S2220 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-02 - Meeting postponed (06/03/2014)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-02 - Meeting postponed (06/03/2014)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establish a lifelong learning program designed to provide employees with educational savings accounts to help fund educational programs and training
Title
Employment Security--general Provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel DaPonte [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
Sen. Christopher Ottiano [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-02 | Senate | Meeting postponed (06/03/2014) |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/SenateText14/S2220.pdf |