RI S2209 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government--department Of Children, Youth And Families -- Foster Parents' Bill Of Rights (would Provide For A Statement Of Rights For Foster Parents To Assist Them In The Performance Of Their Duties)
Title
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government--department Of Children, Youth And Families -- Foster Parents' Bill Of Rights (would Provide For A Statement Of Rights For Foster Parents To Assist Them In The Performance Of Their Duties)
Sponsors
Sen. Francis Maher [R] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Rhoda Perry [D] | Sen. Juan Pichardo [D] |
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-25 | Effective without Governor's signature | |
2010-06-17 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-06-08 | House passed in concurrence | |
2010-06-08 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-06-08 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | |
2010-06-08 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-03-24 | Referred to House Judiciary | |
2010-03-23 | Senate read and passed | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2010-02-25 | Committee recommends passage | |
2010-02-25 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-02-09 | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/SenateText10/S2209.pdf |