RI S2092 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prevents the director of the department of corrections from restricting in-person visitation of inmates in the event that the department implemented electronic visitation or contact, such as skype, between inmates and visitors.
Title
Corrections Department
Sponsors
Sen. Jeanine Calkin [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. James Sheehan [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] |
Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/13/2018) |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2092.pdf |