RI S0968 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for an adjustment to the states allocated revenue from the Tiverton gaming facility in the event of a closure.
Title
Video Lottery Games, Table Games And Sports Wagering
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/24/2021) |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/23/2021) |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |