RI S0968 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts Class B license at 375 Smith Street, in the city of Providence from the two hundred feet (200') requirement from schools or places of worship.
Title
Retail Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Retail licenses (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Retail licenses (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-11 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2019-06-26 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2019) |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |