RI S0849 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends and expand the definitions of unfair claims practices committed by insurers with regard to physical inspection, performance of appraisals, retail valuation and total loss notification to owner.
Title
Unfair Claims Settlement Practices Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-20 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2019-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2019) |
2019-06-18 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2019) |
2019-06-14 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2019) |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/11/2019) |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/07/2019) |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |