RI S0787 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a deputy secretary of commerce and housing within the executive office of commerce to oversee housing initiatives and develop a housing plan.
Title
Executive Office Of Commerce
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/06/2021) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0787.pdf |