RI S0782 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates continuing education board (CEB) service of process by certified mail and prohibits claim negotiation with unlicensed public adjusters from excluding coverage to volunteer drivers.
Title
Foreign Insurance Companies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-19 - House - Passage *************************** (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-09-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-09-19 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-09-15 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-06-30 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/30/2017) |
2017-06-29 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-06-29 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-23 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/22/2017) |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2017) |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2017) |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |