RI S0781 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-30 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-30 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires electric and gas distribution companies, with exceptions, to remit fifteen percent (15%) of the amount of demand-side charge collections to the Rhode Island infrastructure bank for any energy-related financing programs.
Title
Duties Of Utilities And Carriers
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] |
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/30/2021) |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-27 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2021) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Meeting postponed (06/24/2021) |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Meeting postponed (06/22/2021) |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2021) |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |