RI S0756 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides local education agencies (LEAs) hiring site-based specialists for reading and math to receive state reimbursement based on enrollment and specific guidelines.
Title
The Education Equity And Property Tax Relief Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/28/2021) |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0756.pdf |