RI S0523 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Picerne-sierra Bayamon, Inc.
Title
To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Picerne-sierra Bayamon, Inc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-04-04 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-03-31 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/04/2017) |
2017-03-28 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-03-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/28/2017) |
2017-03-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2017) |
2017-03-13 | House | Meeting postponed (03/14/2017) |
2017-03-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-03-08 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (03/07/2017) |