RI S0445 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-29 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-29 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits insurance companies from varying the premium rates charged for a health coverage plan based on the gender of the individual policy holder, enrollee, subscriber, or member. Effective 1/1/2021.
Title
Accident And Sickness Insurance Policies
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/28/2019) |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/21/2019) |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2019) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |