RI S0434 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-22 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-22 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows for the issuance of a special driver's license to persons unable to provide a social security number or other information.
Title
Resident Driver Authorization
Sponsors
Sen. Juan Pichardo [D] | Sen. Paul Jabour [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Harold Metts [D] |
Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-22 | Senate | Withdrawn at sponsor's request |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/21/2015) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/SenateText15/S0434.pdf |