RI S0401 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes changes to the motor vehicles laws by repealing the sections that require the filing of security or bond with the DMV following a motor vehicle accident in which the operator of the vehicle does not have insurance.
Title
Safety Responsibility Administration -- Security
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2021-06-30 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/29/2021) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2021) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/08/2021) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |