RI S0383 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows business vehicles which are owned by an entity which a veteran owns, and registered and authorized to conduct business in the state of Rhode Island, to register such business vehicles with veteran plates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Registration Of Vehicles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-04-05SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2019)
2019-02-13SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback