RI S0367 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - Committee recommends passage
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - Committee recommends passage
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the state to take certain actions in regard to state gaming as a result the recent referendum authorizing the establishment of a new casino gaming facility in the town of Tiverton.
Title
Relating To The State-operated Gaming Facilities In Lincoln, Newport, And, When Operations Commence, In Tiverton
Sponsors
Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] |
Sen. Nicholas Kettle [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/06/2017) |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/23/2017) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0367.pdf |