RI S0321 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Updates and modernize the Department of Environmental Management’s ability to enforce environmental laws, and more specifically modifies practices regarding a Notice of Violation.
Title
State Affairs And Government -- Health And Safety
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] |
Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-28 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-28 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-26 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/28/2021) |
2021-06-21 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/21/2021) |
2021-06-10 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/08/2021) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/03/2021) |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2021) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |