RI S0314 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Grants a judge or magistrate the discretion to impose the requirement of blood and/or urine testing or the use of the ignition interlock system.
Title
Motor Vehicle Offenses
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
Sen. John Burke [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - Passage As Amended (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - Passage As Amended (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-06 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Senate passed as amended in concurrence |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-30 | House | House passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2021-06-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/30/2021) |
2021-06-28 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-06-25 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2021) |
2021-06-10 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/08/2021) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/03/2021) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/08/2021) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |