RI S0257 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prevents the consideration of an applicant's credit history in determining automobile insurance rates.
Title
Insurance Rates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/09/2019) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/02/2019) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2019) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |