RI S0217 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires all public schools in grades kindergarten through twelve (12), to have at least one full-time certified school social worker for every four hundred (400) students.
Title
Staffing
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] |
Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/14/2021) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0217.pdf |