RI S0205 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Resolution Respectfully Requesting The Department Of Administration To Conduct A Study On The Technical And Economic Outcomes Of Decarbonizing Rhode Island By 2030
Title
Senate Resolution Respectfully Requesting The Department Of Administration To Conduct A Study On The Technical And Economic Outcomes Of Decarbonizing Rhode Island By 2030
Sponsors
Sen. Samuel Bell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/10/2023) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/SenateText23/S0205.pdf |