RI S0203 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Places oversight of freshwater lakes, streams, and ponds in the fish and wildlife division of the department of environmental management.
Title
Department Of Environmental Management
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-30 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-13 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-07-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B in concurrence |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/30/2017) |
2017-06-29 | House | House passed Sub B |
2017-06-29 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-28 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2017-06-28 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2017) |
2017-05-18 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/17/2017) |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/10/2017) |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/03/2017) |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2017) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |