RI S0072 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-26 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-26 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Senate Commission To Study The Effect And Procedures For The Reorganization Of The Rhode Island Coastal Resources Management Council (crmc) (extends The Reporting And Expiration Dates For The Commission To Study The Effect And Procedures For The Reorganization Of The Crmc From June 9, 2020, To June 1, 2022, And Would Expire On January 3, 2023.)
Title
Senate Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Senate Commission To Study The Effect And Procedures For The Reorganization Of The Rhode Island Coastal Resources Management Council (crmc) (extends The Reporting And Expiration Dates For The Commission To Study The Effect And Procedures For The Reorganization Of The Crmc From June 9, 2020, To June 1, 2022, And Would Expire On January 3, 2023.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-26 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (01/26/2021) |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0072.pdf |