RI S0067 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to the determination of the need to support high-need students a separate and independent qualifying factor of whether the student is an English language learner as defined by the department of education's regulations.
Title
The Education Equity And Property Tax Relief Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-07 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/07/2023) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/SenateText23/S0067.pdf |