RI S0053 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Town of Westerly to issue bonds and notes in an amount not exceeding $2,000,000 to finance the construction, renovation, improvement, alteration, repair, furnishing and equipping of schools and school facilities in the town.
Title
Relating To Authorizing The Town Of Westerly To Issue Not To Exceed $2,000,000 General Obligation Bonds, Notes And Other Evidences Of Indebtedness To Finance The Construction, Renovation, Improvement, Alteration, Repair, Furnishing And Equipping Of Schools And School Facilities In The Town
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-03-09 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2021-03-05 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/09/2021) |
2021-03-04 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/04/2021) |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (02/10/2021) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/04/2021) |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |