RI S0050 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts the trade-in value of pickup trucks under six thousand pounds (6,000 lbs.) gross weight used exclusively for personal use from sales tax.
Title
Sales And Use Taxes -- Liability And Computation
Sponsors
Sen. Edward O'Neil [I] | Sen. Marc Cote [D] | Sen. Elaine Morgan [R] | Sen. Nicholas Kettle [R] |
Sen. Paul Fogarty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/03/2015) |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/SenateText15/S0050.pdf |