RI H8228 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Authorizing The Town Of North Kingstown To Issue Bonds And Notes To An Amount Not Exceeding $9,200,000 To Finance The Construction Of Sewers And Sewerage Systems In The Town Including The Acquisition Of Land Therefor And Authorizing The Imposition Of Sewer Assessments And Service Fees
Title
An Act Authorizing The Town Of North Kingstown To Issue Bonds And Notes To An Amount Not Exceeding $9,200,000 To Finance The Construction Of Sewers And Sewerage Systems In The Town Including The Acquisition Of Land Therefor And Authorizing The Imposition Of Sewer Assessments And Service Fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-25 | Effective without Governor's signature | |
2010-06-17 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-06-09 | Senate passed in concurrence | |
2010-06-09 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2010-06-08 | House read and passed | |
2010-06-08 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-06-08 | Committee recommends passage | |
2010-06-08 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-06-03 | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/HouseText10/H8228.pdf |