RI H8191 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-11 - Committee recommended indefinite postponement
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-11 - Committee recommended indefinite postponement
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TAXATION -- PROPERTY SUBJECT TO TAXATION - Removes the exemption from taxation granted to Bryant University located in Smithfield, RI subjecting the university to full taxation unless, the university and the town of Smithfield reach an agreement on payment in lieu of taxes on or before 6/30/24.
Title
Removes the exemption from taxation granted to Bryant University located in Smithfield, RI subjecting the university to full taxation unless, the university and the town of Smithfield reach an agreement on payment in lieu of taxes on or before 6/30/24.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-11 | House | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2024-06-08 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/11/2024) |
2024-06-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-05-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/04/2024) |
2024-04-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H8191.pdf |