RI H8165 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds thermal systems insulation to the regulation and licensing of mechanical trades.
Title
Mechanical Trades
Sponsors
Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. Cale Keable [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] |
Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/15/2018) |
2018-05-07 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/08/2018) |
2018-05-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-05-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H8165.pdf |