RI H8107 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Cranston to issue not more than $15M general obligation bonds and temporary notes to finance the improvement, renovation, repair, alteration and equipping of schools and school facilities in the city of Cranston.
Title
Authorizing The City Of Cranston To Finance The Improvement, Renovation, Repair, Alteration And Equipping Of Schools And School Facilities In The City By The Issuance Of Not More Than $15,000,000 General Obligation Bonds And Notes Therefor
Sponsors
Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Arthur Handy [D] | Rep. Peter Palumbo [D] | Rep. Robert Jacquard [D] |
Rep. Nicholas Mattiello [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-19 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2014-06-19 | House | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-18 | House | House read and passed |
2014-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-16 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2014-06-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/16/2014) |
2014-04-30 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |