RI H8104 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
This act is the annual statutory construction bill, prepared based upon recommendations of the Law Revision Office. The act would make technical changes and revisions to various general laws.
Title
Relating To Statutes And Statutory Construction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-08 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-07-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2014-06-10 | House | House passed Sub A |
2014-06-04 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/10/2014) |
2014-05-20 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-05-16 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/20/2014) |
2014-05-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-05-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/06/2014) |
2014-04-30 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |