RI H8100 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Making It Easier To Do Business In Rhode Island Part 2: Business Fast-start Office - State Affairs And Government Expedited State Licensure Process
Title
An Act Relating To Making It Easier To Do Business In Rhode Island Part 2: Business Fast-start Office - State Affairs And Government Expedited State Licensure Process
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Ferri [D] | Rep. Raymond Gallison [D] | Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. Maryann Shallcross-Smith [D] |
Rep. Steven Smith [D] | Rep. Joseph Trillo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-29 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-06-28 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-06-03 | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar | |
2010-06-01 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence | |
2010-06-01 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-05-27 | Referred to Senate Corporations | |
2010-05-26 | House passed Sub A | |
2010-05-20 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-05-20 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2010-05-20 | Scheduled for consideration | |
2010-05-13 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2010-05-13 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-05-06 | Introduced, referred to House Committee on Small Business |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/HouseText10/H8100.pdf |