RI H8017 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Alcoholic Beverages - Retail Licenses (would Enable For Profit Legitimate Theaters To Apply For A Class T Liquor License)
Title
An Act Relating To Alcoholic Beverages - Retail Licenses (would Enable For Profit Legitimate Theaters To Apply For A Class T Liquor License)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-13 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-07 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-06-07 | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence | |
2012-06-06 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/07/2012) | |
2012-06-06 | House passed Sub A | |
2012-05-31 | Placed on House Calendar (06/06/2012) | |
2012-05-31 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2012-05-29 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/31/2012) | |
2012-05-01 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-04-27 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2012) | |
2012-03-29 | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H8017.pdf |