RI H7962 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Joint Commission To Study The Impact On The State Of Rhode Island From The Acquisition Of Hospitals (creates A 14 Member Joint Commission To Study The Impact On The State Of Rhode Island From The Acquisition Of Hospitals, And Who Would Report Back To The Governor And The General Assembly By March 31, 2019, And Expire On June 30, 2019.)
Title
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Joint Commission To Study The Impact On The State Of Rhode Island From The Acquisition Of Hospitals (creates A 14 Member Joint Commission To Study The Impact On The State Of Rhode Island From The Acquisition Of Hospitals, And Who Would Report Back To The Governor And The General Assembly By March 31, 2019, And Expire On June 30, 2019.)
Sponsors
Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] | Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] | Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
Rep. John Edwards [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2018) |
2018-03-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7962.pdf |