RI H7836 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alters the definition of "affordable housing" to include housing that costs no more than thirty percent (30%) of gross household income for a household with income less than sixty percent (60%) of the median income for city or town.
Title
Rhode Island Housing Resources Act Of 1998 And Towns And Cities - Low And Moderate Income Housing
Sponsors
Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] | Rep. Patricia Morgan [R] | Rep. Antonio Giarrusso [R] | Rep. Robert Nardolillo [R] |
Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2018) |
2018-04-12 | House | Committee transferred to House Municipal Government |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7836.pdf |