RI H7834 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Alcoholic Beverages -- Licenses - Liquor (would Provide That All Retail Liquor Licenses Must Be Maintained On The Premises For Which They Were Issued But Need Not Be Posted)
Title
An Act Relating To Alcoholic Beverages -- Licenses - Liquor (would Provide That All Retail Liquor Licenses Must Be Maintained On The Premises For Which They Were Issued But Need Not Be Posted)
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Ferri [D] | Rep. Douglas Gablinske [D] | Rep. Peter Martin [D] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] |
Rep. Kenneth Vaudreuil [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Effective without Governor's signature | |
2010-06-23 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-06-11 | Senate passed in concurrence | |
2010-06-09 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar | |
2010-06-08 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | |
2010-06-08 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-06-02 | Referred to Senate Constitutional and Regulatory Issues | |
2010-06-01 | House read and passed | |
2010-05-26 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-05-26 | Committee recommends passage | |
2010-05-26 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-04-15 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2010-04-15 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-04-13 | Meeting postponed | |
2010-04-13 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-02-25 | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/HouseText10/H7834.pdf |