RI H7783 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HEALTH AND SAFETY -- PESTICIDE CONTROL - Precludes the use of second generation anticoagulant rodenticide products which contain brodifacoum, bromadiolone, difenacoum, or difethialone, except in certain circumstances.
Title
Precludes the use of second generation anticoagulant rodenticide products which contain brodifacoum, bromadiolone, difenacoum, or difethialone, except in certain circumstances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2024) |
2024-02-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7783.pdf |