RI H7766 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Make it a felony to knowingly disseminate the electronic transmission of indecent materials to minors and would subject those offenders to the Sexual Offender Registration and Community Notification Act.
Title
Children
Sponsors
Rep. Nicholas Mattiello [D] | Rep. Agostinho Silva [D] | Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] |
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-03 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2014-06-03 | House | House passed Sub A |
2014-05-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/03/2014) |
2014-05-28 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-05-23 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/28/2014) |
2014-04-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/01/2014) |
2014-03-24 | House | Meeting postponed (03/25/2014) |
2014-03-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2014-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |