RI H7740 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-20 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-20 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the department of corrections to collect information from individuals entering its custody: sex, race, nativity (country of origin), religion, and level of education.
Title
Relating To State Affairs And Government-- Corrections Department
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2022-05-10 | House | House passed Sub A |
2022-05-06 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/10/2022) |
2022-05-04 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-04-29 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2022-04-29 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/04/2022) |
2022-04-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/06/2022) |
2022-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |