RI H7679 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a cause of action against employers/employees for workplace bullying, harassment and other abusive conduct that is tolerated by employers, and not fall into other categories already protected such as race, color and sex or sexual orientation.
Title
Healthy Workplace
Sponsors
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Moira Walsh [D] | Rep. Ramon Perez [D] |
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2018) |
2018-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7679.pdf |