RI H7676 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PUBLIC UTILITIES AND CARRIERS -- ANNUAL FUNDING FOR RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC TRANSIT AUTHORITY ACT - Provides a mechanism for funding the Rhode Island Public Transit Authority through the use of an interest-free loan to advance certain federal funds.
Title
Provides a mechanism for funding the Rhode Island Public Transit Authority through the use of an interest-free loan to advance certain federal funds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-05-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing (05/07/2024) |
2024-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Public Utilities And Carriers
PUBLIC UTILITIES AND CARRIERS -- ANNUAL FUNDING FOR RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC TRANSIT AUTHORITY ACT
PUBLIC UTILITIES AND CARRIERS -- ANNUAL FUNDING FOR RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC TRANSIT AUTHORITY ACT
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7676.pdf |