RI H7667 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEDURES - Provides that a court shall decide cases without deference to administrative agency interpretation of rules.
Title
Provides that a court shall decide cases without deference to administrative agency interpretation of rules.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2024) |
2024-02-27 | House | Committee transferred to House Judiciary |
2024-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7667.pdf |