RI H7654 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-02 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/03/2022)
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-02 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/03/2022)
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates the corporate tax cut and qualified business income deduction created by the 2017 Tax Cuts and Jobs Act.
Title
Business Corporation Tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/03/2022) |
2022-04-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2022-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7654.pdf |