RI H7654 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Applies the hotel tax distribution formula for entities within the Providence regional tourism district to any and all hotels physically connected to the Rhode Island Convention Center.
Title
Tourism And Development
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] |
Rep. Charlene Lima [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-07-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (07/21/2020) |
2020-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7654.pdf |