RI H7647 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-04 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-04 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government -- Department Of Business Regulations -- Malpractice Insurance (require A List Of All Settlements/judgments Against All Licensed Health Care Professionals & Nursing Homes Be Reported To The Director Of Health / Provide Parameters Within Which The Director Of Health May Establish Regulations For Malpractice Minimums)
Title
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government -- Department Of Business Regulations -- Malpractice Insurance (require A List Of All Settlements/judgments Against All Licensed Health Care Professionals & Nursing Homes Be Reported To The Director Of Health / Provide Parameters Within Which The Director Of Health May Establish Regulations For Malpractice Minimums)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Referred to Senate Judiciary | |
2010-05-04 | House read and passed | |
2010-04-28 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-04-27 | Committee recommends passage | |
2010-04-27 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-03-16 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2010-03-16 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-02-25 | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/HouseText10/H7647.pdf |