RI H7636 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-14 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-14 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires certain persons who have contact with children to get criminal records checks.
Title
The Youth Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Lauren Carson [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] |
Rep. Cale Keable [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-14 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | House | House passed Sub A |
2016-06-10 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/14/2016) |
2016-06-08 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-06-03 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/08/2016) |
2016-03-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2016) |
2016-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |